Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mel Sechlainn (Malachy) Mac eda

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1310AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
22 Jun 1310Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
19 Dec 1312AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
10 Aug 1348DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Mel Sechlainn (Malachy) Mac eda
Archbishop Mel Sechlainn (Malachy) Mac eda (died ) Archbishop of Tuam

  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 500, and Page 237
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast