Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Balduin von Luxembourg

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1285¹Born
12 Feb 130823.1AppointedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
11 Mar 130823.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
21 Jan 135469.0DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Balduin von Luxembourg
Archbishop Balduin von Luxembourg (born 1285, died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPoitiers, Diocese of Poitiers, France

  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 495
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast