Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joseph László Lombos, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Baojing [Paoking, Shaoyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1887Born
1910²22.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jun 193851.1AppointedPrefect of Baojing [Paoking, Shaoyang], China
19 Jul 196376.2DiedPrefect of Baojing [Paoking, Shaoyang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph László Lombos
Father Joseph László Lombos O.F.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Baojing [Paoking, Shaoyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTopolya, Hungary
Death PlaceBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary

  • a priest for 53.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast