Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe de LÚvis

Deceased

Bishop of Auch, France


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1411AppointedBishop of Agde, France
14 Feb 1425AppointedBishop of Auch, France
25 Jan 1454DiedBishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe de LÚvis
Bishop Philippe de LÚvis (died ) Bishop of Auch

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 121, and Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast