Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father André Lesouëf, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1918Born
20 Mar 194324.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Sep 196850.5AppointedPrefect of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia
199778.7RetiredPrefect of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia
6 Jun 200486.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for André Lesouëf
Father André Lesouëf M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kompong-Cham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRedon, France

  • a priest for 61.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast