Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Walter le Rede

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1327AppointedBishop of Cork, Ireland
12 Jul 1327Ordained BishopBishop of Cork, Ireland
20 Oct 1329AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
Feb 1331³DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walter le Rede
Archbishop Walter le Rede (died Feb 1331) Archbishop of Cashel

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 170, and Page 211
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 98, Number 8,352

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 2 Dec 2020

Quantcast