Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves Le Prévôt de Bois Boëssel

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Malo, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Oct 1327AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
31 Aug 1330AppointedBishop of Quimper, France
22 Jan 1333AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
29 Aug 1348DiedBishop of Saint-Malo, France

MicroData Summary for Yves Le Prévôt de Bois Boëssel
Bishop Yves Le Prévôt de Bois Boëssel (died ) Bishop of Saint-Malo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 211, and Page 319
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast