Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain Le Maout

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper, France


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1482AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
8 Mar 1484AppointedBishop of Quimper, France
2 Nov 1493DiedBishop of Quimper, France

MicroData Summary for Alain Le Maout
Bishop Alain Le Maout (died ) Bishop of Quimper

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 175, and Page 137
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1482, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast