Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Bautista Lanuza, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1553Born
16 Sep 161662.8AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
30 Nov 161663.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
24 Aug 162268.8AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
15 Dec 162471.1DiedBishop of Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Bautista Lanuza
Bishop Jerónimo Bautista Lanuza O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHijar
Ordained BishopZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 109
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 133, Number 849
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 23
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,874
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast