Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Lami

Deceased

Bishop of Sarlat, France


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1403AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
27 Feb 1408AppointedBishop of Sarlat, France
15 Oct 1410DiedBishop of Sarlat, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Lami
Bishop Jean Lami (died ) Bishop of Sarlat

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 436, and Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast