Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal Lagier, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1320¹Born
18 Dec 135737.9AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
24 Jan 136848.0AppointedBishop of Glandèves, France
30 May 137151.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
30 May 137151.4Elevated to Cardinal
1375²55.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
Apr 1378³58.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
8 Nov 1392³72.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Lagier
Bertrand Cardinal Lagier O.F.M. (born 1320, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFigeac, Diocese of Cahors, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 21.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 264, and Page 113

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast