Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de la Forêt

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1305²Born
1347²42.0SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
24 Jul 134944.5AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
20 Dec 135045.9AppointedBishop of Paris, France
8 Feb 135247.1AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
23 Dec 135651.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
23 Dec 135651.9Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jun 136156.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de la Forêt
Pierre Cardinal de la Forêt (born 1305, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Suze, Diocese of Le Mans, France
Death PlaceVilleneuve-lés-Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Le Mans, Diocese of Le Mans, France

  • a cardinal for 4.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 426, and Page 489
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast