Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ferdinand Lacretelle, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Haizhou [Haichow, Donghai, Tunghai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1902Born
1921²18.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
7 Jun 193432.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
21 Feb 195148.8AppointedPrefect of Haizhou [Haichow, Donghai, Tunghai], China
1983²80.6ResignedPrefect of Haizhou [Haichow, Donghai, Tunghai], China
5 May 198987.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of Haizhou [Haichow, Donghai, Tunghai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Lacretelle
Father Ferdinand Lacretelle S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Haizhou [Haichow, Donghai, Tunghai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceTaipeh

  • a priest for 54.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast