Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Matthäus Kutschank

Deceased

Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1776Born
21 Sep 179923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
20 Jan 184265.7AppointedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany
19 Dec 184468.6DiedPrefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthäus Kutschank
Father Matthäus Kutschank (born , died ) Prefect of Meißen (Meissen) {Lusazia o Lausitz; Sassonia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNucknitz

  • a priest for 45.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast