Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Bonifacio Maria (Hermann Josef) Krug, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Montecassino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1838Born
19 Mar 186021.5Simple VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
16 Sep 186123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 May 186425.7Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Mar 189758.5SelectedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
11 Mar 189758.5ConfirmedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
19 Mar 189758.5InstalledAbbot of Montecassino, Italy
4 Jul 190970.8DiedAbbot of Montecassino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Maria (Hermann Josef) Krug (VIAF: 258686250)
Abbot Bonifacio Maria (Hermann Josef) Krug O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Montecassino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHünfeld, Diocese of Fulda, Germany
Death PlaceMontecassino, Abbey, Montecassino, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino
Buried Place (Original)Montecassino, Abbey, Montecassino, Territorial Abbey of Montecassino

  • a priest for 47.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: AM, 11 Feb 2019
  • b: Biographia Benedictina, 17 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Sep 2021

Quantcast