Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yoohanon Theodosius Kochuthundil

Bishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1959 Born
22 Dec 198526.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 201758.3AppointedCurial Bishop of Trivandrum (Syro-Malankara), India
5 Aug 201758.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius
21 Sep 201758.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Maius
10 Apr 201859.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India
11 Jun 201960.1SucceededBishop of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara), India

MicroData Summary for Yoohanon Theodosius Kochuthundil (VIAF: 46129891)
Bishop Yoohanon Theodosius Kochuthundil (born ) Bishop of Muvattupuzha

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuthussery Bhagon
Ordained BishopMar Ivanios Nagar, Adoor

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Muvattupuzha (Syro-Malankara).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2017
  • ob: CB, 5 Aug 2017
  • c2: CB, 18 Aug 2017
  • c3: CB, 21 Sep 2017
  • c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2017
  • c234: CB, 25 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,583
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2018
  • s: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast