Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alain de Kerazred (de la Rue)

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1411AppointedBishop of Saint-Pol-de-Léon, France
18 Sep 1419AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
4 Jun 1424DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France

MicroData Summary for Alain de Kerazred (de la Rue)
Bishop Alain de Kerazred (de la Rue) (died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 302, and Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast