Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista de Giudici, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1428¹Born
25 Feb 145830.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Apr 147143.3AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
26 Apr 148254.3AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
4 Feb 148456.0ResignedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
4 Feb 148456.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
15 Apr 148456.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista de Giudici
Archbishop Giovanni Battista de Giudici O.P. (born 1428, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFinale
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 26.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 268, and Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 86
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1471, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast