Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Izquierdo, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1588AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
13 Apr 1590Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
17 Nov 1602DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Juan de Izquierdo
Bishop Juan de Izquierdo O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHuelva, Spain
Ordained Bishop
Death PlaceMérida, Diocese of Yucatán (Mérida)

  • a bishop for 12.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,827
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 103, Number 648
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1590, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast