Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Ireton, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Dec 1278SelectedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
24 Mar 1280Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
1 Mar 1292DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Ireton
Bishop Ralph Ireton C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 289
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 65
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 233
  • crsa: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,902

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast