Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Iuliu Hossu

Deceased

Bishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania

Note/Previous Titular See: (not revealed as Cardinal until after his death)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1885Born
27 Mar 191025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
21 Apr 191732.2AppointedBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
4 Dec 191732.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gherla, Armenopoli, Szamos-Ujvár (Romanian), Romania
19 Jul 193045.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
31 Jan 193146.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Maramureş (Romanian), Romania
29 Aug 194156.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
1947²61.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
28 Apr 196984.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 May 197085.3DiedBishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
5 Mar 197388.0Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication
2 Jun 2019Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Iuliu Hossu (VIAF: 89587004)
Bishop Bl. Iuliu Hossu (born , died ) Bishop of Cluj-Gherla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilasul Mare, Diocese of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 52.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 52
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 68
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast