Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gynwell

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Mar 1347AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
23 Sep 1347Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
5 Aug 1362DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Gynwell
Bishop John Gynwell (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Ordained BishopOxford

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 306
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 76
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 15
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,792

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast