Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1300AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
12 Jul 1300Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
11 Apr 1326AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
1327¹DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Gutiérrez
Bishop Fernando Gutiérrez (died 1327) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 208, and Page 200
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 299, Number 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast