Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregory

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1353AppointedBishop of Down, Ireland
Feb 1353³Ordained BishopBishop of Down, Ireland
27 Feb 1357AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
7 May 1372AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
1384²DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregory
Archbishop Gregory (died 1384) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 231, and Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 500
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,188
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 99, Number 8,460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 7 Dec 2020

Quantcast