Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Gregorio

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1591AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
24 Mar 1591Ordained BishopBishop of Albarracin, Spain
10 Mar 1593AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
27 Oct 1602DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Gregorio
Archbishop Alfonso Gregorio (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDiocese of León
Ordained BishopLa Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100, and Page 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 103, Number 650
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast