Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Graham

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1463AppointedBishop of Brechin, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Dec 1465AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
17 Aug 1472AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1476¹RemovedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1478¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Graham
Archbishop Patrick Graham (died 1478) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Andrews

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 88, and Page 110
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1463, Number 32*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast