Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro González Manso

Deceased

Bishop of Osma, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1523AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
28 Jun 1524Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
26 Oct 1524AppointedBishop of Tuy, Spain
3 Jul 1525AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
13 Mar 1532AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
12 Feb 1537DiedBishop of Osma, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro González Manso
Bishop Pedro González Manso (died ) Bishop of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanillas de Río Tuerto, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada
Death PlaceOsma, Diocese of Osma

  • a bishop for 12.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265, and Page 320
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 36, Number 166
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast