Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Girard

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Oct 1382AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
17 Jul 1385AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
17 Oct 1390AppointedCardinal-Priest
17 Oct 1390Elevated to Cardinal
21 Dec 1390AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
1391²AppointedAdministrator of Nîmes, France
1393²ResignedAdministrator of Nîmes, France
13 Jun 1405AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Mar 1411AppointedAdministrator of Lavaur, France
6 Apr 1412ResignedAdministrator of Lavaur, France
9 Nov 1415DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Girard
Pierre Cardinal de Girard (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Symphorien le Château
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Church, Saint-Symphorien le Château

  • a cardinal for 25.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 310, and Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 518
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Oct 1390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast