Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jan 1407AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 Oct 1409AppointedAdministrator of Nona (Nin), Croatia
11 Aug 1410CeasedAdministrator of Nona (Nin), Croatia
1411¹ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni
Archbishop Giovanni , Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 360, and Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Jul 2021

Quantcast