Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Ghianderoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jun 1519Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 1519AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
17 Jul 1519Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
21 Oct 1530AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
12 Nov 1538AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
1550¹ResignedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Ghianderoni
Bishop Girolamo Ghianderoni , Bishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 237, and Page 108
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 105
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 11
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 89, Number 7,438
  • ~c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast