Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Gatto

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jun 1472AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
18 Aug 1475AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
8 Feb 1479AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
1484²DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gatto
Bishop Giovanni Gatto (died 1484) Bishop of Cefalý

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122, and Page 125
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1472, Number 35*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast