Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso García de Losada, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Plasencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1614¹Born
22 Feb 167258.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Plasencia, Spain
22 Feb 167258.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
19 Mar 168470.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso García de Losada
Bishop Alonso García de Losada O.S.B. (born 1614, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonforte de Lemos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 170
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 209, Number 1,307
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 42
  • plas: CB, 23 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast