Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Giovanni Battista Mauri, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Cartagine


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Apr 1718AppointedVicar Apostolic of Smirne, Turkey
15 Jun 1720AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine
11 Apr 1730DiedTitular Archbishop of Cartagine

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giovanni Battista Mauri
Archbishop Pietro Giovanni Battista Mauri O.F.M. Ref. (died ) Titular Archbishop of Cartagine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarbagnete, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSainte Marie Drapéris, Church, Constantinople

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 145, and Page 360
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,249
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast