Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Romarico Flugi d’Aspermont, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1821Born
25 Nov 186342.7EnteredMember of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Dec 186443.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Dec 186544.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 May 186847.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
21 May 186847.2AppointedAbbot of Saints Nicholas and Benedict
15 Apr 189069.1AppointedAbbot General of Order of Saint Benedict
1896²74.8CeasedAbbot General of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Jul 190483.3DiedAbbot General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Romarico Flugi d’Aspermont
Abbot Romarico Flugi d’Aspermont O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot General Emeritus of Order of Saint Benedict

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceSant’Ambrogio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1870

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Sep 2021

Quantcast