Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eustace de Fauconberg

Deceased

Bishop of London, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1170¹Born
25 Feb 122151.1AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
25 Apr 122151.3Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
2 Nov 122858.8DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eustace de Fauconberg
Bishop Eustace de Fauconberg (born 1170, died ) Bishop of London

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, Chapel, Westminster

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 56
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 284
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast