Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard de Farges

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Feb 1306AppointedBishop of Agen, France
4 Jun 1306AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
5 May 1311AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
Jul 1341³DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Farges
Archbishop Bernard de Farges (died Jul 1341) Archbishop of Narbonne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 425, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast