Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaillard (Galhard) Falguières

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême, France


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1311AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
18 May 1311Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arles, France
24 Jan 1318AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Angoulême, France
Jun 1328³DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaillard (Galhard) Falguières
Archbishop Gaillard (Galhard) Falguières (died Jun 1328) Bishop of Angoulême

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 103, and Page 240
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,701

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast