Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Arnaud Cardinal de Falguières

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1308AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
11 Mar 1308Ordained BishopArchbishop of Arles, France
19 Dec 1310AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
19 Dec 1310Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 1317DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

MicroData Summary for Arnaud de Falguières
Arnaud Cardinal de Falguières (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau, Miramont, Guyenne, Diocese of Toulouse, France
Ordained BishopPoitiers, Diocese of Poitiers, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Pierre de la Romieu, Church, near Condom, Diocese of Condom, France

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1310
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Number 8,696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Dec 2020

Quantcast