Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Eugène Fahy, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Yangzhou [Yangchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1911Born
5 Nov 193423.1EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
19 May 194533.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Feb 195139.4AppointedPrefect of Yangzhou [Yangchow], China
198371.3ResignedPrefect of Yangzhou [Yangchow], China
17 Aug 199684.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Yangzhou [Yangchow], China

MicroData Summary for Eugène Fahy
Father Eugène Fahy S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Yangzhou [Yangchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLomita Park, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California, USA
Ordained PriestShanghai

  • a priest for 51.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1981
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast