Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gonzalo Espina Peruyero

Priest of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1953 Born
20 May 197926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oviedo, Spain
26 Aug 201764.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
19 Mar 202168.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Espina Peruyero
Father Gonzalo Espina Peruyero (born ) Priest of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiloña, Asturias, Diocese of Oviedo

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Oviedo.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 21 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast