Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Orozco Enriquez de Armendáriz Castellanos y Toledo, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Michoacán, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551²Born
17 Apr 156615.2ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
27 Jun 160554.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Burgos, Spain
27 Jun 160554.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
11 Sep 160554.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
30 Aug 161059.6AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
9 Sep 161160.6InstalledBishop of Santiago de Cuba
15 Apr 162473.2AppointedBishop of Michoacán, México
5 Dec 162877.9DiedBishop of Michoacán, México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Orozco Enriquez de Armendáriz Castellanos y Toledo
Bishop Alonso Orozco Enriquez de Armendáriz Castellanos y Toledo O. de M. (born 1551, died ) Bishop of Michoacán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
Ordained BishopBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos, Spain

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,396
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 206, and Page 236
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 120, Number 765
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 27
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,835

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast