Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquier de Vaux

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1435AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
25 Oct 1439AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
28 Jan 1443AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
10 Jul 1447DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Pasquier de Vaux
Bishop Pasquier de Vaux (died ) Bishop of Lisieux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 189, and Page 148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast