Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Durand de Saint-Pourçain, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Sep 1317AppointedBishop of Limoux, France
14 Feb 1318AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
13 Mar 1326AppointedBishop of Meaux, France
10 Sep 1334DiedBishop of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Durand de Saint-Pourçain
Bishop Guillaume Durand de Saint-Pourçain O.P. (died ) Bishop of Meaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 334, and Page 91
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast