Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro della Scala, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Verona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jan 1291SelectedBishop of Verona, Italy
25 Feb 1291Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
12 Sep 1295DiedBishop of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro della Scala
Bishop Pietro della Scala O.P. (died ) Bishop of Verona

  • a bishop for 4.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 522

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast