Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni di Prangins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Nov 1433AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
1 Apr 1440AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
23 Oct 1444ResignedBishop of Aosta, Italy
23 Oct 1444AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
7 May 1446DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni di Prangins
Archbishop Giovanni di Prangins (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 173, and Page 98
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast