Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Donnellan

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1776AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland
20 Dec 1776AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiphellus
7 May 1778SucceededBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
6 Jul 1786³DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrew Donnellan
Bishop Andrew Donnellan (died ) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Death PlaceLoughrea, Co. Galway

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 89, and Page 170
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 31
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast