Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico della Rovere, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1518¹Born
23 Mar 156951.2AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
May 1569²51.3Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
19 Mar 158769.2DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico della Rovere
Bishop Domenico della Rovere O.P. (born 1518, died ) Bishop of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsti, Diocese of Asti
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceAsti, Diocese of Asti
Buried Place (Original)Maddalena, Church, Asti, Diocese of Asti

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 121
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 7*
  • ob/c2/loc: AT, 15 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast