Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cristoforo Cardinal della Rovere

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

Cardinal-Priest of San Vitale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1434Born
3 Aug 147238.1SelectedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
15 Sep 147238.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
10 Dec 147743.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 147743.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
1 Feb 147843.6DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo della Rovere
Cristoforo Cardinal della Rovere (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 245
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1472, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast