Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Vincenzo de’ Giuli

Deceased

Bishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 May 1645AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
21 May 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
19 Jan 1672DiedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Vincenzo de’ Giuli
Bishop Gian Vincenzo de’ Giuli (died ) Bishop of Massa Lubrense

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,614

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast