Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gilles Cardinal Deschamps

Deceased

Administrator of Coutances, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹Born
May 1408²58.3SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
27 Sep 140858.7Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
2 Oct 140959.7ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
6 Jun 141161.4AppointedAdministrator of Coutances, France
6 Jun 141161.4Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jun 141161.4AppointedCardinal-Priest
5 Mar 1413³63.1DiedAdministrator of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilles Deschamps
Gilles Cardinal Deschamps (born 1350, died ) Administrator of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Death PlaceRouen, Archdiocese of Rouen
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 205

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast